CT HB05123 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit state and municipal governments from exercising the use of eminent domain for certain commercial purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Eminent Domain For Certain Commercial Purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 667
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 403
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-20HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/13
2019-01-30HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback