CT HB05125 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase municipal participation on the Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority's Board of Directors.
Title
An Act Increasing Municipal Representation On The Board Of Directors For The Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Referred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology | |
2012-04-17 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-17 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-02 | File Number 209 | |
2012-04-02 | House Calendar Number 177 | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |