CT HB05125 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the property tax abatement for certain first responders from one thousand dollars to one thousand five hundred dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Property Tax Abatement For Certain First Responders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 189 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12HousePublic Act 19-36
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 606
2019-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-21HouseFile Number 79
2019-03-21HouseHouse Calendar Number 69
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-21HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-16HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback