CT HB05142 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to study whether nursing homes are meeting the state's residents' need for long-term institutional care.
Title
An Act Concerning Nursing Home Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | House Recommitted to Aging |
2018-03-26 | House | File Number 33 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 52 |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |