CT HB05142 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish the crime of mutilation of female genitalia of minors as a class D felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting Female Genital Mutilation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseVote to Hold Until Next Meeting
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-13HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-31HousePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-18HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback