CT HB05145 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 654
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 654
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish regional behavioral health action organizations and to study the efficacy of such organizations and make recommendations concerning their services.
Title
An Act Concerning Regional Behavioral Health Action Organizations.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Robin Comey [D] |
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Rep. William Petit [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 246 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 654 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2019-05-30 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 668 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 404 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-22 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-02-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-18 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |