CT HB05153 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 388
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 388
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow firefighters, fire departments, emergency services personnel and emergency medical service organizations to purchase or receive body armor without meeting the transferor of such body armor in person.
Title
An Act Concerning The Purchase Of Body Armor By Firefighters, Fire Departments, Emergency Services Personnel And Emergency Medical Service Organizations.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. J.P. Sredzinski [R] | Rep. Fred Camillo [R] | Rep. John Frey [R] |
Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Ben Mcgorty [R] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 388 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 241 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |