CT HB05169 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Office of Early Childhood.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Office Of Early Childhood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 302 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 213 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 213 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Public Act 18-172 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 526 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4605 |
2018-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2018-04-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 232 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 165 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |