CT HB05181 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - File Number 37
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - File Number 37
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide a mechanism by which recipients of unsolicited newspapers may opt out of delivery.
Title
An Act Concerning The Delivery Of Free Newspapers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | File Number 37 |
2016-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 60 |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |