CT HB05181 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to study a new rate class for gas companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring The Public Utilities Regulatory Authority To Study The Creation Of A New Rate Class For Gas Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 412 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 187 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HouseSpecial Act 19-20
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24HouseFile Number 986
2019-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 600
2019-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8229
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 389
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 242
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-26HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback