CT HB05213 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - File Number 662
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - File Number 662
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Connecticut Siting Council to impose civil fines and award attorney fees and costs to opposing parties when it determines that the petitioner has misrepresented or omitted material facts.
Title
An Act Concerning The Siting Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | File Number 662 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Calendar Number 495 | |
2010-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-27 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-27 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4346 | |
2010-04-12 | File Number 446 | |
2010-04-12 | House Calendar Number 251 | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |