CT HB05213 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - File Number 670
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - File Number 670
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To improve the oral health of children.
Title
An Act Concerning Oral Health Assessments Of Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 150 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | File Number 670 |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 491 |
2018-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4154 |
2018-04-10 | House | File Number 352 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 226 |
2018-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-23 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |