CT HB05229 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 607
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 607
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize municipal zoning commissions to regulate the height, size, location, brightness and illumination of all signs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Regulation Of Signs By Zoning Commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 607 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 361 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |