CT HB05240 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require new construction of affordable housing developments to comply with additional accessibility, lighting and renewable energy requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning Requirements For New Construction Of Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |