CT HB05244 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a person who has a valid order of protection to request that such person's landlord change the locks to the person's dwelling unit.
Title
An Act Concerning Additional Housing Protections For A Victim Of Family Violence Or Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |