CT HB05249 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit towns and the state from purchasing and using artificial turf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Purchase Or Use Of Artificial Turf By The State And Municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-25HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback