CT HB05251 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 999
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 999
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the possession and trade of shark fins.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Sale, Trade Or Distribution Of Shark Fins In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 200 AS AMENDED (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | File Number 999 |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 621 |
2019-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9533 |
2019-04-23 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-23 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | File Number 49 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 43 |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-02-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |