CT HB05254 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand and provide administrative support for the Commission for Child Support Guidelines.
Title
An Act Expanding The Commission For Child Support Guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 307 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 311 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 311 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-10 | House | Public Act 16-48 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 385 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | File Number 47 |
2016-03-15 | House | House Calendar Number 66 |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |