CT HB05254 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Public Hearing 02/04
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To enable municipalities such as Bolton, Bozrah, Bloomfield, Bethany, Coventry, Hartford, Lyme, New London, Norfolk, North Stonington and Warren to impose a conveyance tax on certain real property sales in order to generate funds for the preservation of open space.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Pilot Program Authorizing Municipalities To Impose A Buyer's Conveyance Fee On Real Property To Fund The Purchase And Stewardship Of Open Space.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-01-28HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-18HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback