CT HB05270 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 270
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require (1) the Commissioner of Public Health to adopt regulations (A) providing for the certification and education of peer support specialists, and (B) specifying the peer support services that a certified peer support specialist may provide to another individual in this state, and (2) health insurance coverage for peer support services provided by certified peer support specialists on an outpatient basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Certain Services Provided By Peer Support Specialists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 270
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 176
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-02-27HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-31HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback