CT HB05304 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Senate Calendar Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Senate Calendar Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the use of pink blaze clothing for hunting.
Title
An Act Authorizing The Use Of Pink Blaze Clothing For Hunting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 213 (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 614 |
2019-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 171 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 121 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |