CT HB05314 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Senate Calendar Number 615
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To address the environmental harm caused to Long Island Sound and other waterways from the intentional release of helium balloons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Release Of Helium Balloons Into The Atmosphere.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 208 (Y: 123 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 615
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 172
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 122
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08HouseJoint Favorable
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-01-28HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-18HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback