CT HB05362 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the penalty for intentionally injuring a police animal or dog in a volunteer canine search and rescue team.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Penalty For The Intentional Injury Of A Police Animal Or Dog In A Volunteer Canine Search And Rescue Team.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-02-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback