CT HB05384 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To impose additional disclosure and reporting requirements on pharmacy benefits managers, health carriers, pharmaceutical manufacturers, the Office of Health Strategy and the Insurance Department concerning prescription drug rebates and the cost of prescription drugs.
Title
An Act Concerning Prescription Drug Costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 285 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 18-41 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 524 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5048 |
2018-04-09 | House | File Number 317 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 212 |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |