CT HB05384 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - File Number 980
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To reduce litter in parks, waterways and urban centers and to create cost-savings in the recycling process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring The Elimination Of Single-use Styrofoam Containers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 167 AS AMENDED (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseFile Number 980
2019-05-23HouseSenate Calendar Number 591
2019-05-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
2019-05-21HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9198
2019-05-21HouseAmendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 9150
2019-04-15HouseFile Number 648
2019-04-15HouseHouse Calendar Number 393
2019-04-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-06HousePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-03-04HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-18HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback