CT HB05395 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise the environmental justice law in order to better serve the municipalities and communities that it is intended to benefit.
Title
An Act Requiring An Evaluation Of The State's Environmental Justice Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 118 (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 501 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-15 | House | File Number 649 |
2019-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 394 |
2019-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-11 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |