CT HB05417 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate Calendar Number 601
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate Calendar Number 601
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the use of blockchain technology to manage elector information.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study The Use Of Blockchain Technology To Manage Elector Information.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. William Buckbee [R] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D] |
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 193 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 601 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | File Number 81 |
2019-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 71 |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |