CT HB05418 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the State Contracting Standards Board contained in their 2018 report.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The State Contracting Standards Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 669 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 405 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |