CT HB05455 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow the state forest fire warden to supplement existing staff resources with individuals who meet certain federal forest fire fighter training and qualification requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Qualified Forest Fire Fighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 329 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 123 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12HousePublic Act 19-37
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 511
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 391
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 244
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-12HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback