CT HB05481 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 03/01
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To fully implement the legalization of industrial hemp in accordance with public act 15-202.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Implementing The Legalization Of Industrial Hemp.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 03/01
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback