CT HB05517 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - File Number 813
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit life insurance companies doing business in this state from refusing to deliver or issue a life insurance policy or contract solely on the basis that such policy or contract insures, or will insure, the life of an individual who has been convicted of a felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Life Insurance Coverage For Convicted Felons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 53 AS AMENDED (Y: 101 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseFile Number 813
2019-04-26HouseSenate Calendar Number 426
2019-04-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7364
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 272
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 178
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-03-07HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-07HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback