CT HB05521 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-23-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) redefine "preexisting conditions provision" to include preexisting conditions regardless of whether medical advice, diagnosis, care or treatment was recommended or received for such conditions prior to the effective date of coverage under a health insurance policy or plan, (2) require short-term insurance policies to exclude the same preexisting conditions provision as other individual and group health insurance policies, and (3) repeal redundant exceptions concerning mandatory coverage for breast cancer survivors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding Required Health Insurance Coverage For Preexisting Conditions.

Sponsors

House Insurance and Real Estate Committee CommitteeRep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Liz Linehan [D]Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]
Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. Jason Doucette [D]
Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Rep. Philip Young [D]Rep. Bobby Gibson [D]Rep. Robin Comey [D]
Rep. Laura Devlin [R]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]
Rep. Quentin Phipps [D]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]
Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Dave Yaccarino [R]Rep. Michelle Cook [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]
Rep. John Frey [R]Rep. Carol Hall [R]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. Fred Camillo [R]
Rep. Patricia Miller [D]Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R]Rep. Patrick Boyd [D]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]
Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Linda Orange [D]Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]
Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Rep. David Michel [D]Rep. Stephen Harding [R]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]
Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D]Rep. Rick Lopes [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Anne Hughes [D]
Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Timothy Ackert [R]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Sen. George Logan [R]
Rep. Devin Carney [R]Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R]Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Sen. Paul Formica [R]Rep. Tom Delnicki [R]
Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]Rep. William Petit [R]Rep. Anthony Nolan [D]Sen. Henri Martin [R]
Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R]Sen. John Kissel [R]Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]
Sen. Dan Champagne [R]Rep. Susan Johnson [D]Rep. Maria Horn [D]Sen. Kevin Witkos [R]
Sen. Norman Needleman [D]Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Sen. Christine Cohen [D]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]
Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Rep. Brandon McGee [D]Sen. Leonard Fasano [R]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]
Rep. Joseph Serra [D]Sen. Mae Flexer [D]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 360 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 26 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-134
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 378
2019-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 273
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 179
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
2019-02-27HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-24HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback