CT HB05524 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To increase penalties for the sale of fentanyl.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Penalties For The Sale Of Fentanyl.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12HousePublic Act 19-38
2019-06-04HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 504
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 772
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 480
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-29HousePublic Hearing 04/03
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-08HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback