CT HB05525 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that inmates adhere to their offender accountability plans and actively participate and complete eligible programming in order to earn risk reduction credits.
Title
An Act Concerning Accountability For The Earned Risk Reduction Credit Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Motion Failed (JF) |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |