CT HB05527 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To protect the public by prohibiting persons convicted of serious felonies from participating in the earned risk reduction credit program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Excluding Persons Convicted Of Certain Serious Felonies From The Earned Risk Reduction Credit Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseMotion Failed (JF)
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback