CT HB05559 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Motor Vehicles to make available, upon request by a person with autism spectrum disorder, a blue envelope to contain such person's operator's license, registration and insurance card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Communication Between Persons With Autism Spectrum Disorder And Law Enforcement Officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 46 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 422
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 393
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 245
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation
2019-03-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-08HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/13
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback