CT HB05611 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the adjustment of population data so as to count incarcerated persons as residents of their last town of residence rather than as residents of the town in which the correctional facility is located.
Title
An Act Concerning The Counting Of Incarcerated Persons For Purposes Of Determining Legislative Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |