CT HB05683 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a dry land water safety instruction pilot program for children in not more than fifteen municipalities.
Title
An Act Establishing A Dry-land Water Safety Instruction Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 389 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 43 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Special Act 19-21 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 401 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | File Number 114 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 92 |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2019-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |