CT HB05687 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 394
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 394
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit a requirement that a decreased generation service rate appear on a customer's bill where the electric supplier and a customer have agreed to decrease the electric generation service rate from the rate that appears on the customer's bill.
Title
An Act Concerning Electric Supplier Electric Generation Service Rates And Customer Bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 394 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 247 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |