CT HB05703 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 931
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit persons who offer consumer goods and services to the public from refusing to accept cash as a form of payment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Acceptable Forms Of Currency As Payment In Local Businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 AS AMENDED (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseFile Number 931
2019-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 531
2019-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8955
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 467
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 292
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on General Law
2019-03-18HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback