CT HB05713 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit housing providers from considering a prospective tenant's criminal conviction after certain time periods.
Title
An Act Concerning Consideration Of Criminal Convictions Of A Prospective Tenant.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Rep. Brandon McGee [D] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. Joshua Hall [D] |
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | No Action |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 176 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 126 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2019-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |