CT HB05740 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Vote to Draft
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To permit municipalities to regulate handicapped parking spaces to ensure the availability of ample handicapped parking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Municipal Regulation Of Handicapped Parking Spaces.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/13
2019-01-30HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback