CT HB05762 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To promote efficiencies by privatizing services currently provided by the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Contractors By The Department Of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Motion Failed (JF) |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |