CT HB05765 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Establishing The Federal Shutdown Affected Employees Loan Program And Providing Additional Assistance To Federal Employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Federal Shutdown Affected Employees Loan Program And Providing Additional Assistance To Federal Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 1 (Y: 54 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 2 (Y: 127 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 1 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-01-24SenateSpecial Act 19-1
2019-01-22SenateSigned by Governor in Original
2019-01-22SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Governor
2019-01-22SenateIn Concurrence
2019-01-22SenateSenate Passed
2019-01-22SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2019-01-22HouseHouse Passed
2019-01-22HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3315
2019-01-21HouseEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback