CT HB05779 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the reporting deadline of the Task Force to Study Voluntary Admission to the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Extending The Reporting Deadline Of The Task Force To Study Voluntary Admission To The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. Rosa Rebimbas [R] | Sen. George Logan [R] | Rep. Robin Green [R] |
Rep. David Labriola [R] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Sen. Joan Hartley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 335 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-13 | House | Special Act 19-9 |
2019-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 611 |
2019-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Passed |
2019-03-13 | House | File Number 52 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Calendar Number 46 |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2019-02-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |