CT HB05817 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 404
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 404
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure official checkers in a polling place loudly and clearly announce the voter identification number of an elector permitted to receive a ballot such that any unofficial checker can hear such information.
Title
An Act Concerning Official And Unofficial Checkers In Polling Places.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 39 (Y: 91 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 404 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 675 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 411 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |