CT HB05820 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 932
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to study ranked-choice voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Ranked-choice Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 143 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 144 AS AMENDED (Y: 75 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseFile Number 932
2019-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 532
2019-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8793
2019-04-15HouseFile Number 650
2019-04-15HouseHouse Calendar Number 395
2019-04-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback