CT HB05823 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 676
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require consultants for candidates participating in the Citizens' Election Program to register with the State Elections Enforcement Commission and sign an affidavit agreeing to abide by said program's expenditure limits if such candidate is paid more than fifteen per cent of the amount of such candidate's grant under said program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Campaign Consultants And Use Of Funds Under The Citizens' Election Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 676
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 412
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-21HousePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-03-18HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback