CT HB05844 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 863
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 863
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require housing authorities to provide voter registration applications to prospective tenants.
Title
An Act Requiring Housing Authorities To Provide Voter Registration Applications To Prospective Tenants.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Rep. Brandon McGee [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 76 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 58 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 MOTION TO REFER (Y: 58 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 78 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 57 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 77 MOTION TO REFER (Y: 58 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 78 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 57 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | File Number 863 |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 471 |
2019-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-07 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8113 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8041 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7863 |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 177 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 127 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2019-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |