CT HB05870 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the legal transfer of an assault weapon possessed under a certificate of possession and large capacity magazines possessed under a declaration of possession between people who already legally possess such weapons or magazines.
Title
An Act Concerning Transfer Of Assault Weapons And Large Capacity Magazines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Motion Failed (JF) |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |